OK HJR1029 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HJR1029
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-20 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution approving and disapproving certain proposed permanent rules of Oklahoma state agencies; directing distribution.
Title
Joint Resolution approving and disapproving certain proposed permanent rules of Oklahoma state agencies; directing distribution.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. John Jordan [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - House - House: Administrative Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-20 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-05-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2 |
2017-05-19 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2017-05-19 | House | General Order |
2017-05-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Administrative Rules Committee |
2017-05-11 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules |
2017-05-10 | House | Authored by Representative Jordan |
2017-05-10 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HJR1029 (Carry Over) 2017-05-20 - Direct to Calendar