OK HJR1029 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Constitutional amendment; providing ad valorem exemption for disabled troopers and surviving spouse if not remarried.
Title
Constitutional amendment; providing ad valorem exemption for disabled troopers and surviving spouse if not remarried.
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Brogdon [R] | Rep. Ed Cannaday [D] | Rep. David Derby [R] | Rep. Rex Duncan [R] |
Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Jason Nelson [R] | Rep. Eric Proctor [D] |
Rep. Mike Reynolds [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Sen. Steve Russell [R] | Rep. Seneca Scott [D] |
Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House: R (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House: R (Y: 71 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2009-02-25 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in conference | |
2010-02-23 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-02-03 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-05-21 | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree | |
2009-05-06 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2009-05-04 | HC's named: Scott, Jones, Lamons, Ritze, Proctor, Hickman, Miller | |
2009-04-30 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-20 | SA's received | |
2009-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-16 | coauthored by Russell | |
2009-04-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-03-25 | coauthored by Reynolds, Ritze | |
2009-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-24 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-24 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Ritze, Reynolds | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2009-03-16 | First Reading | |
2009-03-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-12 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-12 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-12 | Amended | |
2009-03-12 | Authored by Senator Brogdon (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-12 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Derby, Nelson, Duncan, Kern, Cannaday, Proctor, Tibbs, Hoskin | |
2009-03-12 | General Order | |
2009-02-26 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Scott | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |