OK HJR1026 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]

Summary

Constitutional amendment; providing disabled veterans with manufactured homes ad valorem exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; providing disabled veterans with manufactured homes ad valorem exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Died in conference
2010-02-23 Conference granted, GCCA
2010-02-03 SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
2009-05-22 Coauthored by Senator(s) Crutchfield, Adelson, Ballenger, Bass, Burrage, Corn, Easley, Eason McIntyre, Garrison, Gumm, Ivester, Johnson (Constance), Laster, Leftwich, Lerblance, Paddack, Rice, Sweeden, Wyrick, Ellis, Wilson
2009-05-22 CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
2009-05-11 HC's named: Schwartz, Blackwell, Jackson, Joyner, Hilliard, Morgan
2009-05-07 Conference granted, GCCA
2009-04-27 SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
2009-04-21 SA's received
2009-04-21 Engrossed to House
2009-04-20 Referred for engrossment
2009-04-20 Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2009-04-20 General Order, Considered
2009-04-02 Title stricken
2009-04-02 Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2009-03-31 Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR
2009-03-18 Second Reading referred to Finance
2009-03-12 First Reading
2009-03-12 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2009-03-11 Referred for engrossment
2009-03-11 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2009-03-11 Authored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author)
2009-03-11 Coauthored by Representative(s) Smithson, Inman
2009-03-11 General Order
2009-02-19 Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman, Thompson
2009-02-19 CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2009-02-03 Second Reading referred to Rules
2009-02-02 Authored by Representative Schwartz
2009-02-02 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
ART 108DNew CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback