OK HJR1024 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-19 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Constitution; modifying provisions for exempt treatment of manufacturing facilities; ballot title; filing.
Title
Oklahoma Constitution; modifying provisions for exempt treatment of manufacturing facilities; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Justice, Mazzei, Jolley, Marlatt, Griffin, Pittman, Floyd |
2015-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2015-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 |
2015-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Mazzei (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-11 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Hickman |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |