OK HJR1020 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - coauthored by Holt
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - coauthored by Holt
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State Constitution; calling for a state constitutional convention; ballot title; filing.
Title
State Constitution; calling for a state constitutional convention; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Sen. Kyle Loveless [R] | Sen. David Holt [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Senate | coauthored by Holt |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 8 |
2015-03-04 | House | General Order |
2015-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Loveless (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Banz |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |