OK HJR1015 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HJR1015
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution; creating the Rural Health Care Infrastructure Fund; providing for the transfer of monies held in the Tobacco Settlement Endowment Trust Fund; ceasing monies received; ballot title; filing.
Title
Joint Resolution; creating the Rural Health Care Infrastructure Fund; providing for the transfer of monies held in the Tobacco Settlement Endowment Trust Fund; ceasing monies received; ballot title; filing.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Biggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Biggs |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HJR1015 (Carry Over) 2017-02-15 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee