OK HJR1013 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - coauthored by Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - coauthored by Pittman
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution opposing the proposed Environmental Protection Agency and Army Corps of Engineers rule defining waters of the United States; distribution.
Title
Joint Resolution opposing the proposed Environmental Protection Agency and Army Corps of Engineers rule defining waters of the United States; distribution.
Sponsors
Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Rep. Jerry McPeak [D] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] |
Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] | Rep. Tom Newell [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2015-03-10 | Senate | coauthored by Roberts (Dustin), Bennett |
2015-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Russ, Newell |
2015-03-09 | House | General Order |
2015-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative McPeak |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |