OK HJR1012 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-30 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment; guaranteeing the right to engage in certain farming and ranching practices; ballot title; filing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment; guaranteeing the right to engage in certain farming and ranching practices; ballot title; filing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-30HouseFiled with Secretary of State
2015-04-30SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2015-04-30HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2015-04-29HouseReferred for enrollment
2015-04-29HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 7
2015-04-29HouseSA's read, adopted
2015-04-22HouseSA's received
2015-04-22SenateEngrossed to House
2015-04-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-04-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6
2015-04-21SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2015-04-21SenateSenate Rule suspended
2015-04-14Senatecoauthored by Echols
2015-04-13Senatecoauthored by Cockroft
2015-04-08SenateReported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
2015-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2015-03-12Senatecoauthored by Hall
2015-03-11Senatecoauthored by McBride, Sanders
2015-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2015-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-03-10HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-03-10HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 6
2015-03-10HouseAmended
2015-03-10HouseAuthored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
2015-03-10HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Murdock, Pfeiffer, Park, Newell, Denney
2015-03-10HouseGeneral Order
2015-02-11HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2015-02-03HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2015-02-02HouseAuthored by Representative Biggs
2015-02-02HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hjr1012&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hres/HJR1012%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HJR1012%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hres/HJR1012%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HJR1012%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HJR1012%20SAHJR%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/hres/HJR1012%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HJR1012_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HJR1012_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback