OK HCR1067 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Urging Congress to protect and support the Capper-Volstead Act and other related federal statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Congress to protect and support the Capper-Volstead Act and other related federal statutes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-28 Filed with Secretary of State
2010-05-28 Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
2010-05-28 Enrolled, signed, to Senate
2010-05-28 Referred for enrollment
2010-05-28 Adopted, returned to House
2010-05-28 coauthored by Crain, Schulz
2010-05-28 Considered
2010-05-28 Direct to Calendar
2010-05-27 First Reading
2010-05-27 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2010-05-26 Adopted, referred for engrossment
2010-05-26 Coauthored by Representative(s) Fields, Ritze
2010-05-26 Considered
2010-05-11 Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author)
2010-05-11 Authored by Representative DeWitt, Armes
2010-05-11 Introduced

Subjects


Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback