OK HCR1040 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Congratulations; passage of the Morrill Act of 1862; distribution.
Title
Congratulations; passage of the Morrill Act of 1862; distribution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-17 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2012-05-17 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-17 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-16 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-16 | Adopted, returned to House | |
2012-05-16 | coauthored by Fields | |
2012-05-16 | Considered | |
2012-05-16 | Direct to Calendar | |
2012-05-09 | First Reading | |
2012-05-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-09 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | |
2012-05-09 | Considered | |
2012-05-07 | Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author) | |
2012-05-07 | Authored by Representative Denney | |
2012-05-07 | Introduced |