OK HCR1019 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 73-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-12 - Coauthored by Representative Conley
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

National Day of Prayer; May 7, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Day of Prayer; May 7, 2020.

Sponsors

Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R]Sen. Rob Standridge [R]Rep. Ken Luttrell [R]Rep. Charles Ortega [R]
Rep. Harold Wright [R]Rep. Mike Sanders [R]Rep. Lewis Moore [R]Rep. Todd Russ [R]
Rep. Dustin Roberts [R]Rep. Sean Roberts [R]Rep. Tommy Hardin [R]Rep. Jadine Nollan [R]
Rep. Charles McCall [R]Rep. Mark McBride [R]Rep. Jon Echols [R]Rep. Chad Caldwell [R]
Rep. Chris Kannady [R]Rep. Mark Lepak [R]Rep. Ben Loring [D]Rep. John Pfeiffer [R]
Rep. Johnny Tadlock [D]Rep. Kevin Wallace [R]Rep. Rhonda Baker [R]Rep. Carol Bush [R]
Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R]Rep. Avery Frix [R]Rep. Tom Gann [R]Rep. Justin Humphrey [R]
Rep. Dell Kerbs [R]Rep. Mark Lawson [R]Rep. Ryan Martinez [R]Rep. Kevin McDugle [R]
Rep. Marcus McEntire [R]Rep. Carl Newton [R]Rep. Mike Osburn [R]Rep. Kevin West [R]
Rep. Tammy West [R]Rep. Rande Worthen [R]Rep. Zack Taylor [R]Rep. Jacob Rosecrants [D]
Rep. Jeff Boatman [R]Rep. Denise Brewer [D]Rep. Ty Burns [R]Rep. Trey Caldwell [R]
Rep. Sherrie Conley [R]Rep. Rusty Cornwell [R]Rep. Denise Hader [R]Rep. Dean Davis [R]
Rep. Sheila Dills [R]Rep. Derrel Fincher [R]Rep. Andy Fugate [D]Rep. Jim Grego [R]
Rep. David Hardin [R]Rep. Toni Hasenbeck [R]Rep. Brian Hill [R]Rep. Ronny Johns [R]
Rep. Lundy Kiger [R]Rep. Robert Manger [R]Rep. Thomas Marti [R]Rep. Stan May [R]
Rep. Nicole Miller [R]Rep. Garry Mize [R]Rep. Jim Olsen [R]Rep. Daniel Pae [R]
Rep. Kenton Patzkowsky [R]Rep. Logan Phillips [R]Rep. Randy Randleman [R]Rep. Cynthia Roe [R]
Rep. Lonnie Sims [R]Rep. David Smith [R]Rep. Chris Sneed [R]Rep. Marilyn Stark [R]
Rep. Jay Steagall [R]Rep. Danny Sterling [R]Rep. John Talley [R]Rep. Mark Vancuren [R]
Rep. Ross Ford [R]Rep. Brad Boles [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-12SenateCoauthored by Representative Conley
2020-05-07SenateFirst Reading
2020-05-07HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-05-06HouseAdopted, referred for engrossment
2020-05-06HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Grego, Nollan, Frix, Luttrell, Gann, Wallace, Smith, Dills, Pae, Talley, Burns, Russ, Johns, Roe, Sterling, Fincher, May, Stark, Boles, McBride, Hasenbeck, Cornwell, Sneed, McCall, Fetgatter, Vancuren, Humphrey, Moore, Marti, CrosswhiteHader, West (Kevin), Lawson, Davis, Sanders, Manger, Hardin (David), Phillips, Olsen, Hill, Miller, Sims, Taylor, Kannady, Worthen, Newton, Osburn, Caldwell (Chad), Martinez, Tadlock, McEntire, Lepak, Ford, Steagall, Hardin (Tommy), Ortega, Rosecrants, Loring, Fugate, Brewer, Bush, Mize, Wright, Caldwell (Trey), Kerbs, Randleman, Patzkowsky, Echols, Kiger, Pfeiffer, West (Tammy), Baker, Roberts (Dustin), Boatman, McDugle
2020-05-06HouseConsidered
2020-05-04HouseAuthored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
2020-05-04HouseAuthored by Representative ODonnell
2020-05-04HouseIntroduced

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback