OK HCR1015 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-9-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution commemorating NORAD and Canada's partnerships with Oklahoma and the United States; distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution commemorating NORAD and Canada's partnerships with Oklahoma and the United States; distribution.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseFiled with Secretary of State
2018-05-03SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-05-03HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-05-02HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-05-02SenateAdopted, returned to House
2018-05-02SenateCoauthored by all other Senators
2018-05-02SenateConsidered
2018-05-02SenateDirect to Calendar
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-04-30HouseAdopted, referred for engrossment
2018-04-30HouseConsidered
2018-03-28HouseAuthored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
2018-03-28HouseAuthored by Representative Ford (Roger), Watson
2018-03-28HouseIntroduced

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback