OK HCR1008 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR1008

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

National Day of Prayer; observing May 4, 2017, as the National Day of Prayer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Day of Prayer; observing May 4, 2017, as the National Day of Prayer.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08HouseFiled with Secretary of State
2017-05-08SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-05-08HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-05-04HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-05-04SenateAdopted, returned to House
2017-05-04SenateCoauthored by all other Senators
2017-05-04SenateConsidered
2017-05-04SenateDirect to Calendar
2017-05-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Scott
2017-05-04SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-05-04HouseAdopted, referred for engrossment
2017-05-04HouseConsidered
2017-04-24HouseAuthored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
2017-04-24HouseAuthored by Representative Cockroft
2017-04-24HouseIntroduced

Same As/Similar To

HCR1008 (Carry Over) 2017-05-08 - Filed with Secretary of State

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback