OK HCR1008 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR1008
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Day of Prayer; observing May 4, 2017, as the National Day of Prayer.
Title
National Day of Prayer; observing May 4, 2017, as the National Day of Prayer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Filed with Secretary of State |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-08 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-04 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Coauthored by all other Senators |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Considered |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Scott |
2017-05-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-04 | House | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered |
2017-04-24 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2017-04-24 | House | Authored by Representative Cockroft |
2017-04-24 | House | Introduced |
Same As/Similar To
HCR1008 (Carry Over) 2017-05-08 - Filed with Secretary of State