OK HCR1004 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HCR1004

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 41-8)
Status: Passed on February 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

American Indians and tribal nations; commemorating and directing a moment of silence; distribution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

American Indians and tribal nations; commemorating and directing a moment of silence; distribution.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-16HouseFiled with Secretary of State
2017-02-16SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-02-16HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-02-15HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-02-15SenateAdopted, returned to House
2017-02-15SenateCoauthored by all other Senators
2017-02-15SenateConsidered
2017-02-15SenateDirect to Calendar
2017-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-02-13HouseAdopted, referred for engrossment
2017-02-13HouseAuthored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author)
2017-02-13HouseConsidered
2017-02-08HouseAuthored by Representative Hoskin
2017-02-08HouseIntroduced

Same As/Similar To

HCR1004 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Filed with Secretary of State

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback