OK HCR1003 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-17)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-17)
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Proclamation; proclaiming September 25, 2011, as S.M. "Monsieur" Moore Day; distribution.
Title
Proclamation; proclaiming September 25, 2011, as S.M. "Monsieur" Moore Day; distribution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2011-03-22 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-03-22 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-21 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-03-21 | Adopted, returned to House | |
2011-03-21 | coauthored by all other Senators | |
2011-03-21 | Considered | |
2011-03-21 | Direct to Calendar | |
2011-03-02 | First Reading | |
2011-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-01 | Adopted, referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-01 | Authored by Senator Ford (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-01 | Considered | |
2011-02-21 | Authored by Representative Martin (Steve) | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced |