OK HB4412 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Natural resources; creating the Healthy Soil Program Act; defining terms; requiring Oklahoma Conservation Commission administer program; effective date.
Title
Natural resources; creating the Healthy Soil Program Act; defining terms; requiring Oklahoma Conservation Commission administer program; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-27 - House - House: VETO OVERRIDE WITHOUT EMER (Y: 77 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Filed with Secretary of State |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Measure returned to House |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Veto overridden: Ayes: 41 Nays: 6 |
2022-05-27 | House | To Senate |
2022-05-27 | House | Veto overridden: Ayes: 77 Nays: 8 |
2022-05-26 | House | Vetoed 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2022-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-19 | House | To Senate |
2022-05-19 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 9 |
2022-05-19 | House | CCR adopted |
2022-05-17 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2022-05-17 | House | Title restored |
2022-05-17 | House | CCR submitted |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Pederson, Murdock, Dugger, Kidd, Pemberton, Boren, Dossett (J.J.) |
2022-05-09 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2022-05-02 | House | SA's received |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-04-28 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 5 |
2022-03-10 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Pederson (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Lowe (Dick) |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |