OK HB4411 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; deleting limitation that restricts the number of post-licensure inspections conducted in a calendar year; effective date.
Title
Medical marijuana; deleting limitation that restricts the number of post-licensure inspections conducted in a calendar year; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Dick Lowe [R] | Sen. Lonnie Paxton [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2022-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-23 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh), McDugle |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Lowe (Dick) |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |