OK HB4367 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; surplus property requirements for Department of Transportation; exemption; effective date.
Title
State government; surplus property requirements for Department of Transportation; exemption; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2 |
2022-03-22 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-22 | House | Amended |
2022-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Pederson (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-22 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2022-02-21 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Remove Representative Hill as principal House author and substitute with Representative Patzkowsky |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Hill |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |