OK HB4362 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Economic development; creating the Center for the Advancement of Science and Technology Intern Partnership STEM Workforce Pipeline Program; effective date; emergency.
Title
Economic development; creating the Center for the Advancement of Science and Technology Intern Partnership STEM Workforce Pipeline Program; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Sen. Jessica Garvin [R] | Rep. Rhonda Baker [R] | Rep. Mickey Dollens [D] |
Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Logan Phillips [R] | Sen. Chris Kidd [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2022 |
2022-05-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-12 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-11 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-11 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 4 |
2022-05-11 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kidd |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 4 |
2022-03-14 | House | Amended |
2022-03-14 | House | Third Reading rescinded |
2022-03-14 | House | Third Reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Baker, McDugle, Phillips, Dollens |
2022-03-14 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Emergency added |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Hill |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |