OK HB4353 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Identification cards for inmates; certified copies of birth certificates; consolidated record cards; REAL ID Noncompliant Identification Cards; restrictions; effective date.
Title
Identification cards for inmates; certified copies of birth certificates; consolidated record cards; REAL ID Noncompliant Identification Cards; restrictions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2022 |
2022-04-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-21 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-23 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Fugate |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2022-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Hill |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |