OK HB4330 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Returned to General Order
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-24 - Returned to General Order
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; registered nurse programs; adding program; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; registered nurse programs; adding program; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 60 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Returned to General Order |
2022-03-24 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 60 Nays: 20 |
2022-03-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 52 |
2022-03-24 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-24 | House | Amended |
2022-03-24 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2022-02-21 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Sneed |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |