OK HB4210 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Attorney General; duties; data; human trafficking; Human Trafficking Response Unit; effective date; emergency.
Title
Attorney General; duties; data; human trafficking; Human Trafficking Response Unit; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Boatman [R] | Sen. Darrell Weaver [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. Emily Virgin [D] |
Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Rep. Daniel Pae [R] | Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | House | Approved by Governor 05/20/2022 |
2022-05-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-16 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1 |
2022-05-16 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2022-04-26 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Floyd |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Virgin |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Russ |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-10 | House | Amended |
2022-03-10 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Emergency added |
2022-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae, Bush |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2022-02-10 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Boatman |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |