OK HB4195 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education; concurrent enrollment; freshman; sophomore; tuition waiver; effective date.
Title
Higher education; concurrent enrollment; freshman; sophomore; tuition waiver; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 5 |
2022-03-01 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2022-03-10 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-10 | House | General Order |
2022-02-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nollan |
2022-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |