OK HB4194 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; directing courts to assess patterns of abuse and present written findings for persons arrested for certain crimes; effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; directing courts to assess patterns of abuse and present written findings for persons arrested for certain crimes; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | House | Approved by Governor 04/29/2022 |
2022-04-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-27 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Roe |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2022-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-21 | House | General Order |
2022-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |