OK HB4161 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Department of Public Safety; directing the completion and implementation of duties related to REAL ID by certain date; authorizing certain expenditures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Public Safety; directing the completion and implementation of duties related to REAL ID by certain date; authorizing certain expenditures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseApproved by Governor 05/21/2020
2020-05-15HouseSent to Governor
2020-05-15SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-15HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2020-05-15HouseReferred for enrollment
2020-05-15SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2020-05-15SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
2020-05-15SenateJCR adopted
2020-05-14SenateDirect to Calendar
2020-05-13Senatecoauthored by Pittman
2020-05-13SenateFirst Reading
2020-05-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2020-05-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2020-05-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 16
2020-05-13HouseJCR adopted
2020-05-13HouseGeneral Order
2020-05-12HouseJCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2020-05-04HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2020-04-06HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Rader
2020-04-06HouseAuthored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
2020-04-06HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace, Hilbert
2020-04-06HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback