OK HB4138 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Remove Representative May as principal House author and substitute with Representative Roberts (Sean)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-22 - Remove Representative May as principal House author and substitute with Representative Roberts (Sean)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; unlawful carry of firearms in certain places; scope of prohibitied act; exeption; concealed carry during State Fair; effective date.
Title
Firearms; unlawful carry of firearms in certain places; scope of prohibitied act; exeption; concealed carry during State Fair; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Sen. Warren Hamilton [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
Rep. Wendi Stearman [R] | Rep. Tom Gann [R] | Rep. David Hardin [R] | Rep. David Smith [R] |
Rep. Avery Frix [R] | Rep. Marilyn Stark [R] | Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] | Rep. Jim Grego [R] |
Rep. Rick West [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] | Rep. Ty Burns [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] |
Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] | Rep. Danny Williams [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] |
Sen. Cody Rogers [R] | Sen. Blake Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Remove Representative May as principal House author and substitute with Representative Roberts (Sean) |
2022-02-22 | House | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Roberts (Sean) |
2022-02-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean) |
2022-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative May |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |