OK HB4109 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
School employees; creating an Education Employee Assistance Program within the Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; effective date; emergency.
Title
School employees; creating an Education Employee Assistance Program within the Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 7 |
2022-03-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson |
2022-03-21 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Vancuren |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |