OK HB4107 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers; directing State Board of Education to issue teaching certificate for teacher certified by a federally recognized tribal nation; effective date.
Title
Teachers; directing State Board of Education to issue teaching certificate for teacher certified by a federally recognized tribal nation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Paxton |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 7 |
2022-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Hicks, Dossett (J.J.) |
2022-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley, Phillips, Randleman, Culver |
2022-03-08 | House | General Order |
2022-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin (David), Walke, Luttrell, Rosecrants, Fugate, Boles, Roberts (Dustin) |
2022-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Vancuren |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |