OK HB4078 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Courts; Council on Judicial Complaints; creating the Office of Judicial Performance Evaluation; effective date.
Title
Courts; Council on Judicial Complaints; creating the Office of Judicial Performance Evaluation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2022-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 5 |
2022-03-15 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2022-03-15 | House | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-15 | House | General Order |
2022-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |