OK HB4074 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Capitol Improvement Authority; expanding authority related to property acquisition and improvements; transactions on behalf of other state agencies; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Capitol Improvement Authority; expanding authority related to property acquisition and improvements; transactions on behalf of other state agencies; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-23HouseApproved by Governor 04/22/2024
2024-04-17HouseSent to Governor
2024-04-17SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2024-04-17HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2024-04-16HouseReferred for enrollment
2024-04-16SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2024-04-16SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
2024-04-16SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2024-04-01SenateReported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
2024-03-19SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2024-03-07SenateFirst Reading
2024-03-07HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2024-03-06HouseReferred for engrossment
2024-03-06HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2
2024-03-06HouseGeneral Order
2024-02-26HouseEmergency added
2024-02-26HouseAuthored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
2024-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2024-02-14HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget
2024-02-14HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2024-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2024-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace
2024-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb4074&Session=2400
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB4074%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB4074%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB4074%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB4074%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB4074%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/hB/HB4074%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB4074%20FULLPCS1%20KEVIN%20WALLACE-JM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB4074%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB4074%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB4074_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB4074_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback