OK HB4050 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; ensuring state agencies are charged no more than actual cost of certain services provided; authorizing settlement of disputes; effective date.
Title
Public finance; ensuring state agencies are charged no more than actual cost of certain services provided; authorizing settlement of disputes; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |