OK HB4015 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Education; permitting certain complaints to be filed with the Attorney General's Office of Civil Rights Enforcement; effective date.
Title
Education; permitting certain complaints to be filed with the Attorney General's Office of Civil Rights Enforcement; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House: State Powers Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute State Powers Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | Referred to State Powers |
2022-02-14 | House | Withdrawn from Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Conley |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |