OK HB4003 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; income tax deduction; infertility treatments; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; income tax deduction; infertility treatments; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace |
2020-02-26 | House | Remove Representative Wallace as principal House author and substitute with Representative Fetgatter |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-06 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |