OK HB3994 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public retirement systems; Teachers' Retirement System of Oklahoma; postretirement earnings limitations; effective dates.
Title
Public retirement systems; Teachers' Retirement System of Oklahoma; postretirement earnings limitations; effective dates.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Wright [R] | Sen. Darcy Jech [R] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Davis |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Wright |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |