OK HB3974 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Failed in Committee - Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Failed in Committee - Education
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Education scholarships; Oklahoma Equal Opportunity Education Scholarship Act; definitions; effective date.
Title
Education scholarships; Oklahoma Equal Opportunity Education Scholarship Act; definitions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 59 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Failed in Committee - Education |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Finance Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 32 |
2024-03-12 | House | Amended |
2024-03-12 | House | House Rule suspended |
2024-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron |
2024-03-12 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-13 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |