OK HB3971 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; authorizing the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority to employ secret shoppers; inspections; investigative results; effective date.
Title
Medical marijuana; authorizing the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority to employ secret shoppers; inspections; investigative results; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 76 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-05-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 |
2022-05-20 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2022-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2022-05-19 | House | To Senate |
2022-05-19 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 3 |
2022-05-19 | House | CCR adopted |
2022-05-18 | House | Title restored |
2022-05-18 | House | CCR submitted |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Leewright, Paxton, Taylor, Rosino, Dossett (J.J.) |
2022-05-04 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2022-04-28 | House | SA's received |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2022-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 8 |
2022-03-23 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh), McDugle |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2022-02-21 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Burns |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |