OK HB3970 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Energy
Pending: Senate Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Energy
Pending: Senate Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Renewable gas energy; making certain declaration; requiring the Corporation Commission to issue a report and recommendations to the Legislature by a certain date; effective date.
Title
Renewable gas energy; making certain declaration; requiring the Corporation Commission to issue a report and recommendations to the Legislature by a certain date; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Utilities Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Utilities Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2020-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 11 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amended |
2020-03-11 | House | General Order |
2020-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Utilities Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Utilities |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McBride |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |