OK HB3966 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; teachers; Education Leadership Oklahoma Act; National Board certification renewal; bonuses; Minimum Salary Schedule; effective date.
Title
Schools; teachers; Education Leadership Oklahoma Act; National Board certification renewal; bonuses; Minimum Salary Schedule; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark McBride [R] | Sen. Brenda Stanley [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Rep. Jacob Rosecrants [D] |
Rep. Kelly Albright [D] | Rep. Derrel Fincher [R] | Rep. David Hardin [R] | Rep. Toni Hasenbeck [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 1 |
2020-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fincher |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-26 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Albright, Rosecrants, Moore, Hardin (David) |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative McBride, Hasenbeck |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |