OK HB3965 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Physician assistants; Pharmacy Act; prescriptions for controlled dangerous substances; Physician Assistant Act; committee; members; requirements; practice agreements; prescribing; emergency.
Title
Physician assistants; Pharmacy Act; prescriptions for controlled dangerous substances; Physician Assistant Act; committee; members; requirements; practice agreements; prescribing; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | Emergency added |
2024-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Echols |
2024-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules |
2024-02-22 | House | Withdrawn from Public Health Committee |
2024-02-15 | House | Remove Representative Echols as principal House author and substitute with Representative McEntire |
2024-02-13 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2024-02-13 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |