OK HB3964 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Aid; allocation; prohibiting assessment of certain penalty if a school district exceeds certain limits during certain fiscal year; effective date; emergency.
Title
State Aid; allocation; prohibiting assessment of certain penalty if a school district exceeds certain limits during certain fiscal year; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Chad Caldwell [R] | Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R] | Rep. Carl Newton [R] | Sen. Ron Sharp [R] |
Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Approved by Governor 05/21/2020 |
2020-05-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2020-05-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2020-05-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2020-05-15 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 1 |
2020-05-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Newton |
2020-05-15 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2020-05-14 | House | SA's received |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 |
2020-05-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Sharp |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education committee |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Emergency added |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Common Education |
2020-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |