OK HB3954 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; specifying manner by which distance between properties shall be measured; licensing; emergency.
Title
Medical marijuana; specifying manner by which distance between properties shall be measured; licensing; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 13 |
2020-03-09 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-09 | House | Amended |
2020-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Brooks (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |