OK HB3920 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Referred to County and Municipal Government
Pending: House County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Referred to County and Municipal Government
Pending: House County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency medical services; definition; effective date.
Title
Emergency medical services; definition; effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | House | Referred to County and Municipal Government |
2022-02-28 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Remove Representative Pfeiffer as principal House author and substitute with Representative Smith |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |
Oklahoma State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb3920&Session=2200 |
Text | http://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB3920%20INT.PDF |