OK HB3913 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-14 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation funding; appropriation; County Improvements for Roads and Bridges Fund; effective date; emergency.
Title
Transportation funding; appropriation; County Improvements for Roads and Bridges Fund; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Sen. Roger Thompson [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] |
Rep. Ty Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-14 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Burns |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean) |
2020-03-03 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | Title stricken |
2020-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-06 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace, Russ |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |