OK HB3889 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-09 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Domestic violence; domestic violence forensic exam pilot program; establishing Domestic Violence Examination Fund; effective date.
Title
Domestic violence; domestic violence forensic exam pilot program; establishing Domestic Violence Examination Fund; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-12 | House | Title stricken |
2024-03-12 | House | Amended |
2024-03-12 | House | General Order |
2024-03-07 | House | Remove Representative Kannady as principal House author and substitute with Representative Harris |
2024-03-06 | House | Remove Representative Ford as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kannady |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-15 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Ford |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |