OK HB3886 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Banking; defining term; authorizing savings promotion raffles; effective date.
Title
Banking; defining term; authorizing savings promotion raffles; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2020-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-05 | House | General Order |
2020-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2020-02-13 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |