OK HB3879 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public Competitive Bidding Act; contracts; dollar amounts; effective date.
Title
Public Competitive Bidding Act; contracts; dollar amounts; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2020-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-09 | House | Amended |
2020-03-09 | House | General Order |
2020-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-06 | House | Withdrawn from Government Efficiency Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |