OK HB3859 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; tax credit; railroad reconstruction and replacement expenditures; credit limit; credit cap increase; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; tax credit; railroad reconstruction and replacement expenditures; credit limit; credit cap increase; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Sen. Roger Thompson [R] | Rep. Charles Ortega [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] |
Rep. John Pfeiffer [R] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
Rep. Carl Newton [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 5 |
2020-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-02 | House | Amended |
2020-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert, Ortega, Sanders, Humphrey, Newton, Pfeiffer |
2020-03-02 | House | General Order |
2020-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson |
2020-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |