OK HB3852 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; modifying definitions; removing certain wattage restrictions; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; modifying definitions; removing certain wattage restrictions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-10 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Strom |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |