OK HB3828 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; Office of Management and Enterprise Services; artificial intelligence; Administrative Office of the Courts; inventory; procedures; effective date.
Title
State government; Office of Management and Enterprise Services; artificial intelligence; Administrative Office of the Courts; inventory; procedures; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: General Government: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Government Modernization and Technology Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Government Modernization and Technology Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 37 |
2024-03-13 | House | Title stricken |
2024-03-13 | House | Amended |
2024-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano |
2024-03-13 | House | General Order |
2024-02-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae |
2024-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization and Technology Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization and Technology |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |